No. 17-6829
Title:Bobby Jo Hardy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11275)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 18, 2017)
Dec 12 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2017 to January 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2018.
Jan 17 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 01 2018Reply of petitioner Bobby Hardy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Bobby Hardy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Bobby Hardy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1 East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Bobby Hardy
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States