No. 17-682
Title:Lonnie Oliver, Superintendent, State Correctional Institution at Cambridge Springs, et al., Petitioners
Audrey McDaniels
Docketed:November 8, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-3485)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2017)
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 22 2017Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2018)
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondent Audrey McDaniels in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Audrey McDaniels.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 27 2018Record Requested.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 13 2018Record received from U.S.C.A. for the 3rd Circuit (1 box of state court records). The remaining record is electronic and available on PACER.
Mar 15 2018Agreement to Dismiss Case Pursuant to U.S. Sup. Ct. R. 46.1 of Oliver, Supt., State Corr. Inst., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

Attorneys for Petitioners
Nancy Winkelman
    Counsel of Record
District Attorney's Office
Three South Penn Square
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Party name: Oliver, Supt., State Corr. Inst., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Salvatore C. Adamo
    Counsel of Record
1866 Leithsville Road, #306
Hellertown, PA 18055
(215) 751-1735
Party name: Audrey McDaniels