No. 17-6769
Title:Broderick C. James, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 14, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12238)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2017)
Dec 06 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Broderick James filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
W. Matthew Dodge
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
101 Marietta Street, NW, Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30303

(404) 688-7530
Party name: Broderick James
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States