No. 17-670
Title:Joel Henrik Stone, Petitioner
v.
Montana
Docketed:November 6, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(DA 16-0340)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2017)
Dec 01 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2017 to January 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2018.
Jan 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Montana to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 16 2018Response Requested. (Due February 15, 2018)
Feb 15 2018Brief of State of Montana in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred Anthony Rowley
    Counsel of Record
350 South Grand Avenue
Fiftieth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

213-683-9100
Party name: Joel Henrik Stone
Attorneys for Respondent
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Montana Department of Justice
215 N. Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

dales@mt.gov
406-444-7008
Party name: State of Montana