No. 17-67 | |
Title: | City of Fresno, California, et al., Petitioners v. Chris Willis, et al. |
Docketed: | July 13, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-16560, 14-16641) |
Decision Date: | March 1, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 7, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 06 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2017) |
Aug 08 2017 | Brief of respondents Chris Willis, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. |
Aug 29 2017 | Reply of petitioners City of Fresno, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Steven Jeff Renick Counsel of Record | Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP 801 So. Figueroa Street, 15th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90017 sjr@manningllp.com | 213-624-6900 |
Party name: City of Fresno, et al. | ||
Steven J. Renick | Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP 801 So. Figueroa Street, 15th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90017 sjr@manningllp.com | (213) 624-6900 |
Party name: City of Fresno, California, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Ellen Lake Counsel of Record | 4230 Lakeshore Avenue Oakland, CA 94610 elake@earthlink.net | 510-272-9393 |
Party name: Chris Willis, et al. |