No. 17-667
Title:Pioneer Centres Holding Company Stock Ownership Plan and Its Trustees, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alerus Financial, N.A.
Docketed:November 6, 2017
Linked with 17A164
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1227)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2017Application (17A164) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2017 to November 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 10 2017Application (17A164) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 2, 2017.
Nov 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2017)
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2017 to February 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 5, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dro@virginia.edu
434-924-3127
Party name: Pioneer Centres Holding, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP
1550 Seventeenth Street
Suite 500
Denver, CO 80202

shannon.stevenson@dgslaw.com
303-892-7328
Party name: Alerus Financial