No. 17-6664
Title:Michael A. Mays, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11861)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 6, 2017)
Nov 30 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2017 to January 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 5, 2018.
Jan 05 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 12 2018Reply of petitioner Michael Mays filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 07 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Michael Mays filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Michael Mays filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Conrad B. Kahn
    Counsel of Record
201 South Orange Ave., Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

407-648-6338
Party name: Michael Mays
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States