No. 17-664
Title:Petroleo Brasileiro S.A. - Petrobras, et al., Petitioners
v.
Universities Superannuation Scheme Limited, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1914)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 14 2017Brief of respondents Universities Superannuation Scheme Limited, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2017Reply of petitioners Petroleo Brasileiro S.A., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Financial Economists and Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Associacao Brasileira De Bancos Internacionais filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of Europeanissuers aisbl filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOtherOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lewis Jeffrey Liman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

lliman@cgsh.com
212-225-2000
Party name: Petroleo Brasileiro S.A., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy A. Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
Pomerantz, LLP
600 Third Avenue, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10016

jalieberman@pomlaw.com
212-661-1100
Party name: Universities Superannuation Scheme Limited, et al.
Other
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Law Professors
Christian Romeyn Everdell
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
800 Third Avenue, 21st Floor
New York, NY 10022

ceverdell@cohengresser.com
212-957-7600
Party name: Associacao Brasileira De Bancos Internacionais
Jason Philip Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Morrison Cohen LLP
909 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

jgottlieb@morrisoncohen.com
212-735-8600
Party name: Europeanissuers aisbl
David Rudolph Lurie
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David R. Lurie, PLLC
194 President Street
Brooklyn, NY 11231

david@davidlurielaw.com
347-651-0194
Party name: Financial Economists and Legal Scholars
Richard A. Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

rrosen@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association