No. 17-659
Title:All Nippon Airways, et al., Petitioners
v.
Daniel Wortman, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Linked with 17A168
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15362, 15-15364)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2017Application (17A168) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 14 2017Application (17A168) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Waiver of right of respondents Daniel Wortman, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 13 2017Response Requested. (Due December 13, 2017)
Nov 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2017 to February 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 9, 2018.
Dec 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Air Transport Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
333 South Hope Street
29th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jonathan.faria@kirkland.com
(213) 680-8400
Party name: All Nippon Airways, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Lee Lebsock
    Counsel of Record
Hausfeld, LLP
44 Montgomery Street
Suite 3400
San Francisco, CA 94104

clebsock@hausfeldllp.com
(415)-633-1908
Party name: Daniel Wortman, et al.
Other
Warren L. Dean Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Coburn LLP
1909 K Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

wdean@thompsoncoburn.com
202-585-6908
Party name: International Air Transport Association