No. 17-6577
Title:Richard Arthur Orr, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 1, 2017
Linked with 17A243
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4455)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2017Application (17A243) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 10, 2017 to October 26, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Sep 06 2017Application (17A243) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 26, 2017.
Oct 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 1, 2017)
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2017 to January 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2018
Nov 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 16 2018Reply of petitioner Richard A. Orr filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 24 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 28 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Richard A. Orr filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 18 2019Letter of January 16, 2019 from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua B. Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of Western Dist. of NC, Inc.
One Page Avenue, Suite 210
Asheville, NC 28801

(828) 232-9992
Party name: Richard A. Orr
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Elliott Schulder
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

eschulder@cov.com
202-662-5462
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers