No. 17-6540
Title:Desmond Shotwell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15935)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 30, 2017)
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2017 to January 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2018
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 1, 2018.
Feb 01 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 09 2018Reply of petitioner Desmond Shotwell filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 27 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Desmond Shotwell#09029-104
Federal Correctional Institution
P.O. Box 699, Unit Delta-Alpha
Estill, SC 29918-0699

Party name: Desmond Shotwell
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States