No. 17-654
Title:Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rochelle Garza, as Guardian ad Litem to Unaccompanied Minor J. D.
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5236)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 03 2017Motion to lodge non-record material under seal filed by petitioners.
Nov 08 2017Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 17 2017Response to Motion Requested. (Due December 18, 2017)
Nov 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Legal Center for Defense of Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Brief of respondent Rochelle Garza, as Guardian ad Litem to Unaccompanied Minor J.D. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2017Motion to lodge non-record material under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioners.
Dec 18 2017Letter in response to the motion to lodge non-record material under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent.
Dec 19 2017Reply of petitioners Eric D. Hargan, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 04 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 11 2018Letter of January 11, 2018 from counsel for respondent received. (Distributed)
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 18 2018Letter of January 18, 2018, from counsel for the petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 26 2018Record Requested.
Feb 26 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia. The record is electronic and available on PACER. SEALED materials transmitted separately.
Feb 26 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the D.C. Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER. SEALED materials transmitted separately.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Letter of respondent Rochelle Garza, as Guardian ad Litem to Unaccompanied Minor J.D. filed.
OtherMain Document
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018Motion to lodge non-record material under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.
Jun 04 2018The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The en banc order of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit is vacated and the case is remanded to that court with instructions to direct the District Court to dismiss the relevant individual claim for injunctive relief as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950). Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Rochelle Garza, as Guardian ad Litem to Unaccompanied Minor J.D.
Other
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
5125902655
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Legal Center for Defense of Life