No. 17-652
Title:Marie Henry, as Guardian, Parent, Next of Kin, and for and on Behalf of M. E. Henry-Robinson, a Minor, Petitioner
v.
City of Mt. Dora, Florida, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-11351)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 29 2017Brief of respondents Brett Livingston and Ivelisse Severance in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Juvenile Defender Center.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The National Bar Association.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association for Public Defense.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Dec 04 2017Amicus brief of The National Bar Association not accepted for filing. (December 05, 2017)
Dec 06 2017Response of Brett Livingston and Ivelisse Severance to motion not accepted for filing. (December 06, 2017)
Dec 06 2017Response to the motions for leave to file brief of amicus curiae from respondents Brett Livingston and Ivelisse Severance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Reply of petitioner Marie Henry, as guardian parent next of kin and for and on behalf M.E. Henry-Robinson, a minor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Bailey & Glasser LLP
1054 31st Street, NW
Suite 230
Washington, DC 20007

tbreckenridge@baileyglasser.com
202-463-2101
Party name: Marie Henry
Attorneys for Respondents
Candy L. Messersmith
    Counsel of Record
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA
300 South Orange Avenue
Suite 1400, P.O. Box 1873
Orlando, FL 32802-1873

cmessersmith@rumberger.com
407-839-2171
Party name: Brett Livingston and Ivelisse Severance
Other
Gerald Joseph Gleeson II
    Counsel of Record
Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone P.L. C.
150 West Jefferson Ave.,
Suite 2500
Detroit, MI 48226

gleeson@millercanfield.com
313-963-6420
Party name: National Association for Public Defense
Sandra Jane Wunderlich
    Counsel of Record
Tucker Ellis LLP
100 South 4th Street, Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63102

sandra.wunderlich@tuckerellis.com
314-256-2544
Party name: National Juvenile Defender Center
Don C. A. ParkerSpilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC
300 Kanawha Blvd., East
Charleston, WV 25301

dparker@spilmanlaw.com
304-340-3896
Party name: The National Bar Association