No. 17-651
Title:United States, Petitioner
Douglas D. Jackson
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3693)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 22 2017Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2018)
Jan 22 2018Brief of respondent Douglas D. Jackson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 07 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic, Northwestern Univ. Law School
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611
Party name: Douglas D. Jackson