No. 17-647
Title:Rose Mary Knick, Petitioner
v.
Township of Scott, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Linked with 17A272
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3587)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2017Application (17A272) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2017 to November 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 11 2017Application (17A272) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 1, 2017.
Oct 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rose Mary Knick.
Nov 29 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Township of Scott, PA.
Blanket Consent
Nov 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2018
Dec 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2018Brief of respondent Township of Scott, Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Reply of petitioner Rose Mary Knick filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Mar 08 2018Joint Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 09 2018Joint Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 21, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 20, 2018.
Apr 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rose Mary Knick
Blanket Consent
May 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Township of Scott, Pennsylvania
Blanket Consent
May 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2018Joint motion for a further extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 21 2018Joint motion for a further extension of time granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including May 29, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including July 30, 2018.
May 29 2018Brief of petitioner Rose Mary Knick filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018Joint appendix filed (to be reprinted).
May 29 2018Joint appendix filed (6/4/18 reprint received). (Statement of costs filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Planning Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amici curiae of American Farm Bureau Federation, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and CATL Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Congressmen King, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas and Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens' Alliance for Property Rights Legal Fund and Inversecondemnation.com filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of San Remo Hotel, L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Wednesday, October 3, 2018
Jul 30 2018Brief of respondent Township of Scott, Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cemetery Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 06 2018Brief amici curiae of Takings and Federal Courts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Brief amici curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Brief amici curiae of States of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation 930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

(916) 419-7111
Party name: Rose Mary Knick
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Joseph Kozlowski
    Counsel of Record
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman and Goggin
50 Glenmaura National Blvd.
Moosic, PA 18507

mjkozlowski@mdwcg.com
570-496-4664
Party name: Township of Scott, et al.
Teresa Ficken Sachs
    Counsel of Record
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
2000 Market Street
Suite 2300
Philadelphia, PA 19103

tfsachs@mdwcg.com
215-575-2000
Party name: Township of Scott, Pennsylvania
Other
John Michael Baker
    Counsel of Record
Greene Espel, PLLP
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jbaker@greeneespel.com
6123738344
Party name: American Planning Association
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
11355 West Olympic Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90064

mmberger@manatt.com
(310) 312-4185
Party name: Institute for Justice
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
312-701-7829
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and CATL Fund
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
Timothy Salo Hollister
    Counsel of Record
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
One American Row
Hartford, CT 06103-2819

thollister@goodwin.com
8602515601
Party name: Congressmen Steven King, et al.
Bruce Leroy Ingram
    Counsel of Record
Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP
52 E. Gay Street
Columbus, OH 43215

blingram@vorys.com
614-464-6480
Party name: Ohio Farm Bureau Federation
Devala Anant Janardan
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

djanardan@nahb.org
202-266-8200
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-590-2655
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS AND OKLAHOMA
Kathryn E. Kovacs
    Counsel of Record
Rutgers Law School
217 N. 5th St.
Camden, NJ 08102

kathryn.kovacs@rutgers.edu
8562256771
Party name: Takings and Federal Courts Scholars
Tanya D. Marsh
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest School of Law
1834 Wake Forest Rd.
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

marshtd@wfu.edu
336-758-6059
Party name: Cemetery Law Scholars
Julie Nepveu
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E. Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

jnepveu@aarp.org
(202)-434-2075
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
R. S. Radford
    Counsel of Record
The Radford Center for Law, History & Economics
909 W. 8th St.
Davis, CA 95616

rsradford@gmail.com
530-312-4908
Party name: Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association
Nicole Ursula Rinke
    Counsel of Record
California Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street, PO Box 944255
Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Nicole.Rinke@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-7797
Party name: States of California, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Citizens' Alliance for Property Rights Legal Fund; Inversecondemnation.com
Paul F. Utrecht
    Counsel of Record
Utrecht & Lenvin, LLP
109 Stevenson Street
Fifth Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

putrecht@ullawfirm.com
4153570600
Party name: San Remo Hotel, L.P., et al.
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-349-7202
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Matthew D. Zinn
    Counsel of Record
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
396 Hayes St.
San Francisco, CA 94102

zinn@smwlaw.com
415-552-7272
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.