No. 17-646
Title:Terance Martez Gamble, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16760)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017)
Nov 30 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018.
Dec 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Terance Gamble filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis A. Chaiten
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114

lachaiten@jonesday.com
216-586-7244
Party name: Terance Gamble
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Principal Deputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center and Cato Institute