No. 17-642
Title:Campaign for Southern Equality, et al., Petitioners
v.
Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi, et al.
Docketed:November 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60477, 16-60478)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 29, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 1, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roberta A Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan & Company, LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplanandcompany.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Campaign for Southern Equality, et al.
Other
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
1801 K Street, N.W
Suite 411
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Church-State Scholars