No. 17-6374
Title:Armando Rivera, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13189)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 15, 2017.
Dec 15 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 15 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2018Reply of petitioner Armando Rivera filed.
Main DocumentOther
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 12 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lori Ellen Barrist
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender450 South Australian Avenue, Suite 500
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Lori_Barrist@fd.org
(561) 833-6288
Party name: Armando Rivera
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States