No. 17-637
Title:FTS USA, LLC, et al., Petitioners
Edward Monroe, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:October 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-6063)
   Decision Date:June 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2017)
Nov 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 29, 2017.
Dec 29 2017Brief of respondents Edward Monroe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Reply of petitioners FTS USA, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 955-8500
Party name: FTS USA, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam William Hansen
    Counsel of Record
Apollo Law LLC
400 South 4th Street
Suite 401M - 250
Minneapolis, MN 55415
(612) 927-2969
Party name: Edward Monroe, et al.