No. 17-6357
Title:Edward Tyrone Reeves, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11133)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Dec 13 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 30 2018Reply of petitioner Edward Tyrone Reeves filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 12 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Labonte
    Counsel of Record
400 N. Tampa Street
Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

Adam_Labonte@fd.org
813-228-2715
Party name: Edward Tyrone Reeves
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States