No. 17-6262
Title:Quentery Gates, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 5, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12245)
   Decision Date:July 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 6, 2017)
Oct 16 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Oct 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Oct 27 2017Response Requested. (Due November 27, 2017)
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2017 to December 27, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2017
Dec 27 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 09 2018Reply of petitioner Quentery Gates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
W. Matthew Dodge
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
101 Marietta Street, NW, Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30303

(404) 688-7530
Party name: Quentery Gates
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States