No. 17-626
Vide 17-586
Title:Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al., Appellants
v.
Shannon Perez, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(SA-11-CV-360)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due November 29, 2017)
Oct 27 2017Appendix of Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed.
Nov 29 2017Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Mexican American Legislative Caucus, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Texas Latino Redistricting Task Force.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, Alabama, Michigan, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, and Wisconsin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017Reply of appellants Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction in No. 17-586 is postponed to the hearing of the case on the merits. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 12 2018Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-586. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-586. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 24, 2018. VIDED
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Apr 24 2018Argued. For appellants: Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General of Texas, Austin, Tex. For appellee United States in support of appellants: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For appellees in 17-586: Max Renea Hicks, Austin, Tex. For appellees in 17-626: Allison J. Riggs, Durham, N. C. VIDED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Mexican American Legislative Caucus, et al.
Nina Perales
    Counsel of Record
MALDEF
110 Broadway
Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205

nperales@maldef.org
2102245476
Party name: Texas Latino Redistricting Task Force
Allison J. Riggs
    Counsel of Record
Southern Coalition for Social Justice
1415 West Highway 54, Suite 101
Durham, NC 27707

(919) 323-3942
Party name: Shannon Perez, et al.
Other
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Louisiana Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana, Alabama, Michigan, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, and Wisconsin