No. 17-625 | |
Title: | Mirowski Family Ventures, LLC, Petitioner v. Medtronic, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | October 27, 2017 |
Linked with 17A197 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2015-1996, 2015-2074, 2015-2075) |
Decision Date: | April 4, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 1, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 16 2017 | Application (17A197) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Aug 21 2017 | Application (17A197) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 29, 2017. |
Sep 19 2017 | Application (17A197) to extend further the time from September 29, 2017 to October 27, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Sep 21 2017 | Application (17A197) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 27, 2017. |
Oct 27 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2017) |
Nov 01 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Medtronics, et al. to respond filed. |
Nov 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. |
Nov 16 2017 | Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2017) |
Nov 27 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Boston Scientific Corp.; Guidant Corp. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 13 2017 | Brief of respondents Medtronics, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 22 2017 | Reply of petitioner Mirowski Family Ventures filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. |
Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein Counsel of Record | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. 7475 Wisconsin Ave. Suite 850 Bethesda, MD 20814 tg@goldsteinrussell.com | (202) 362-0636 |
Party name: Mirowski Family Ventures | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
John Michael Jakes Counsel of Record | Finnegan, Henderson, et al. 901 New York Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20001-4413 mike.jakes@finnegan.com | 202 408 4045 |
Party name: Boston Scientific Corp.; Guidant Corp. | ||
Eric J. Magnuson Counsel of Record | Robins Kaplan, LLP 800 LaSalle Plaza, Suite 2800 Minneapolis, MN 55402 EMagnuson@RobinsKaplan.com | 612-349-8548 |
Party name: Medtronics, et al. |