No. 17-618
Title:Washington Alliance of Technology Workers, Petitioner
Department of Homeland Security
Docketed:October 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5235)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 27, 2017.
Dec 13 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Brief of respondent Department of Homeland Security in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 09 2018Reply of petitioner Washington Alliance of Technology Workers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018Petition DENIED.

Attorneys for Petitioner
John Michael Miano
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Ave. N.W.
Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001
(202) 232-5590
Party name: Washington Alliance of Technology Workers
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: Department of Homeland Security