No. 17-6140
Title:Xavier Jones, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11432)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 27, 2017)
Oct 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017.
Nov 27 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2017 to December 27, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 28 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 27, 2017.
Dec 27 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 10 2018Reply of petitioner Xavier Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther
Jan 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 23 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Holt
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office
150 West Flagler Street, Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33130

julie_holt@fd.org
3055307000
Party name: Xavier Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States