No. 17-6086
Title:Herman Avery Gundy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1829)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 23, 2017)
Sep 29 2017Waiver of right of respondents United States to respond filed.
Oct 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 17 2017Response Requested. (Due November 16, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 16 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018Motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari is GRANTED limited to Question 4 presented by the petition.
Mar 13 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the briefing schedule on the merits is granted . The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 25, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 2, 2018.
May 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute & Cause of Action Institute filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
May 25 2018Brief of petitioner Herman Gundy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, Reason Foundation, Cascade Policy Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amici curiae of William D. Araiza and 14 Other Constitutional, Criminal and Administrative Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars Whose Work Includes Sex Offense Studies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jun 01 2018Amicus brief of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty not accepted for filing. (A corrected brief has been submitted - June 1, 2018)
Jun 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Downsize DC Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, October 2, 2018
Aug 02 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Aug 08 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. The record is electronic.
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Herman Gundy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Baumgartel
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.
52 Duane Street
10th Floor
New York, NY 10007

sarah_baumgartel@fd.org
212-417-8772
Party name: Herman Gundy
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union
Donna F. Coltharp
    Counsel of Record
Fed. Pub. Def. for Western Dis
727 East Durango Blvd.
Suite B-207
San Antonio, TX 78206

donna_coltharp@fd.org
(210) 472-6700
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
3000 El Camino Real
Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94306

dfalk@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Todd F. Gaziano
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3033 Wilson Bldv., Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

TGaziano@PacificLegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Sheldon Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

sheldongilbert@gmail.com
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Sean Hecker
    Counsel of Record
Sean Hecker, Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

shecker@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: Scholars Whose Work Includes Sex Offense Studies
Sam Kazman
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

sam.kazman@cei.org
202-331-2265
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute, Reason Foundation, Cascade Policy Institute
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jfmitche@stanford.edu
(650) 723-1397
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato institute, Cause of Action Institute
Andrew D. Silverman
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
Room 8134
New York, NY 10019

asilverman@orrick.com
212-506-3727
Party name: William D. Araiza and 14 Other Constitutional, Criminal and Administrative Law Professors
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

jmorgan@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, Free Speech Coalition, Free Speech Defense and Education Fund, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, Public Advocate of the United States, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee