No. 17-6075 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Keith Tharpe, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:September 23, 2017
Linked with 17A330
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14027)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 23, 2017)
Sep 23 2017Application (17A330) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Sep 26 2017Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden in opposition filed.
Sep 26 2017Application (17A330) referred to the Court.
Sep 26 2017Reply of petitioner Keith Tharpe filed.
Sep 26 2017Application (17A330) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would deny the application.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian S. Kammer
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
303 Elizabeth St. NE
Atlanta, GA 30307

(404)-222-9202
Party name: Keith Tharpe
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

(404) 656-7659
Party name: Eric Sellers, Warden