No. 17-6054
Title:Latellis Everette, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11147)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2017.
Dec 20 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 02 2018Reply of petitioner Latellis Everette filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 16 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Latellis Everette filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Latellis Everette filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Conrad B. Kahn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender's Office
201 S. Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

conrad_kahn@fd.org
(407) 648-6338
Party name: Latellis Everette
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States