No. 17-6026
Title:Anthony Bernard Williams, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 19, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16403)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 19, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 13 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2018.
Jan 04 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 17 2018Reply of petitioner Anthony Bernard Williams filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 29 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy James Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
102 W. Whiting St., Suite 501
Tampa, FL 33602

tjfitz@me.com
(813) 228-0095
Party name: Anthony Bernard Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States