No. 17-601
Title:Ricardo Medrano-Arzate, et al., Petitioners
v.
Paul C. May, Individually and as Sheriff of Okeechobee County, Florida, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2017
Linked with 17A288
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-14170)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2017Application (17A288) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Sep 15 2017Application (17A288) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 22, 2017)
Nov 21 2017Brief of respondent Paul C. May in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2017Brief of respondent Okeechobee County in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2017Reply of petitioners Ricardo Medrano-Arzate, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen F. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Podhurst Orseck, P.A.
Sun Trust International Center, One S.E. 3rd Avenue
Suite 2300
Miami, FL 33131

srosenthal@podhurst.com
(305) 358-2800
Party name: Ricardo Medrano-Arzate, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Matthew Belcastro
    Counsel of Record
Henderson Franklin Starnes and Holt, P.A.
1715 Monroe Street
Fort Myers, FL 33901

matthew.belcastro@henlaw.com
239-344-1205
Party name: Okeechobee County
Bruce W. Jolly
    Counsel of Record
Purdy, Jolly, Giuffreda, and Barranco, P.A.
2455 East Sunrise Blvd., Ste. 1216
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

bruce@purdylaw.com
954-462-3200
Party name: Paul C. May