No. 17-60
Title:City of Bloomfield, New Mexico, Petitioner
v.
Jane Felix, et al.
Docketed:July 11, 2017
Linked with 16A901
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2149)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2017Application (16A901) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2017 to July 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Mar 16 2017Application (16A901) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 6, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2017)
Jul 14 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jul 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 8, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Wisconsin Institue for Law & Liberty filed.
Aug 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Jews for Religious Liberty filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Fraternal Order of Eagles filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States Congress filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Islam and Religious Freedom filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics and Public Policy Center filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief of respondents Jane Felix, et al. in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin H. Theriot
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

ktheriot@ADFlegal.org
(480) 444-0020
Party name: City of Bloomfield, New Mexico
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew G. Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.
201 Third Street, NW
Suite 2200
Albuquerque, NM 87102

aschultz@rodey.com
505-765-5900
Party name: Jane Felix, et al.
Other
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
1320 Main Street, 17 Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
(803)-799-2000
Party name: Center for Islam and Religious Freedom
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
(202)-955-8500
Party name: Members of the United States Congress
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
909-493-5706
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence Reason Foundation, et al.
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: The Foundation for Moral Law
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Bloodgood House, 1139 E. Knapp Street
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
(414)-727-6367
Party name: The Wisconsin Institue for Law & Liberty
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: The Congressional Prayer Caucus Foundation
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

skeller@yettercoleman.com
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
Jeremy Daniel Kernodle
    Counsel of Record
2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75219-7673

jeremy.kernodle@haynesboone.com
(214-651-5000
Party name: International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers
Eric J. Magnuson
    Counsel of Record
Robins & Kaplan LLP
800 LaSalle Avenue, 2800 LaSalle Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55402

emagnuson@robinskaplan.com
612-349-8500
Party name: Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005-5901

kshanmugam@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: The Fraternal Order of Eagles
Benjamin William Snyder
    Counsel of Record
555 11th Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ben.Snyder@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: The Ethics and Public Policy Center
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
(512)-322-2500
Party name: Jews for Religious Liberty