No. 17-587
Title:Mount Lemmon Fire District, Petitioner
v.
John Guido, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2017
Linked with 17A226
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15030)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2017Application (17A226) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 17, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 30 2017Application (17A226) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 18, 2017.
Oct 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Nov 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondents John Guido, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Reply of petitioner Mount Lemmon Fire District filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: Mount Lemmon Fire District
Attorneys for Respondents
Don T. Awerkamp
    Counsel of Record
Awerkamp & Bonilla, PLC
6891 N. Oracle Road, Suite 155
Tucson, AZ 85704

da@abdilaw.com
(520) 798-5282
Party name: John Guido, et al.