No. 17-579
Title:Labor and Industry Review Commission of Wisconsin, Petitioner
v.
Tracey Coleman
Docketed:October 19, 2017
Linked with 17A221
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3254)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 18 2017Application (17A221) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 14, 2017 to October 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Aug 24 2017Application (17A221) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 30, 2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2017)
Nov 13 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2017 to December 20, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Labor and Industry Review Comm'n
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles Rothfeld Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Tracey Coleman