No. 17-5772
Title:Kenneth Roy Conde, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 29, 2017
Linked with 17A11
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11876)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 22 2017Application (17A11) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2017 to August 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 05 2017Application (17A11) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 24, 2017.
Aug 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 28, 2017)
Aug 31 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Kenneth Conde filed.
Sep 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Sep 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 20 2017Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 08 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2017.
Dec 20 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 04 2018Reply of petitioner Kenneth Conde filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Kenneth Conde filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Third supplemental brief of petitioner Kenneth Conde filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda G. Bryn
    Counsel of Record
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1100

(954) 356-7436
Party name: Kenneth Conde
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States