No. 17-5716
Title:Timothy D. Koons, Kenneth Jay Putensen, Randy Feauto, Esequiel Gutierrez, and Jose Manuel Gardea, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:August 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3794, 15-3825, 15-3854, 15-3800, 15-3894)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 25, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2017.
Oct 25 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Dec 18 2017Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioners Timothy D. Koons, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioners GRANTED, and Jeffrey L. Fisher, Esquire, of Stanford, California, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioners in this case.
Jan 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Timothy D. Koons, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 22 2018Brief of petitioners Timothy D. Koons, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Motion for leave to file a supplemental volume of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Timothy D. Koons, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, March 27, 2018
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Families Against Mandatory Minimums filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file a supplemental volume of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2018Reply of petitioners Timothy D. Koons, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Argued. For petitioners: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. (Appointed by this Court.) For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
6507247081
Party name: Timothy D. Koons, et al.
James WhalenCapital Square, Suite 340
400 Locust St.
Des Moines, IA 50309-2360

jim_whalen@fd.org
(515) 309-9610
Party name: Timothy D. Koons, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Amy Baron-Evans
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Office
51 Sleeper St.
5th Fl
Boston, MA 02210

abaronevans@gmail.com
617-391-2253
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: Families Against Mandatory Minimums
Daniel Tyler Hansmeier
    Counsel of Record
500 State Avenue
Suite 201
Kansas City, KS 66101

daniel_hansmeier@fd.org
913-551-6901
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers