No. 17-571
Title:Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Linked with 17A150
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13726)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 04 2017Application (17A150) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2017 to October 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 07 2017Application (17A150) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 13, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2017)
Oct 13 2017Waiver of right of respondents Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 02 2017Response Requested. (Due December 4, 2017)
Nov 28 2017Brief of respondents Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioner Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

apanner@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Fourth Estate Pub. Benefit Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
725 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 1830
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6801
Party name: Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.