No. 17-57
Title:Pacific Gas and Electric Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 11, 2017
Linked with 16A1019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-5082)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2017Application (16A1019) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2017 to July 6, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 02 2017Application (16A1019) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 6, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2017)
Aug 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2017.
Aug 08 2017Brief of respondents California, et al. in support filed.
Sep 11 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 26 2017Reply of petitioners Pacific Gas and Electric Company, et al. filed.
Sep 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 12 2017Joint motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners Pacific Gas & Electric Co., et al. and respondents United States, et al. (Distributed)
Oct 12 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017Joint motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Pacific Gas & Electric Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
415-703-2548
Party name: California, et al.