No. 17-5684
Title:Gregory Eugene Allen, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15598)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 21, 2017)
Aug 29 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Sep 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 20 2017Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 27 2017Reply of petitioner Gregory Eugene Allen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 26 2018Letter of April 26, 2018, from the Solicitor General received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 27 2018Letter of April 27, 2018, form counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 27 2018Letter of April 27, 2018, from the Solicitor General received. (Distributed) (This letter is a corrected version of the Solicitor General's letter of April 26, 2018)
Main Document
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michelle Rachel Yard
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender's Office
201 South Orange Avenue, Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

Michelle_Yard@fd.org
(407) 648-6338
Party name: Gregory Eugene Allen
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States