No. 17-565
Title:Rowan County, North Carolina, Petitioner
v.
Nancy Lund, et al.
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1591)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2017)
Oct 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 15, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 27 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rowan County, North Carolina
Nov 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pittsylvania County, Virginia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2017Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 20 other States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2017Brief amici curiae of 103 State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Brief of respondents Nancy Lund, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2017Reply of petitioner Rowan County, North Carolina filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 18 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 14 2018Rescheduled.
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 01 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 15 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 22 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Mar 28 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 12 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 26 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 16 2018Rescheduled.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 23 2018Rescheduled.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 30 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 06 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 13 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Gorsuch joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Rowan County, North Carolina
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Anderson Brook
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
P.O. Box 28004
Raleigh, NC 27611-8004

cbrook@acluofnc.org
919-834-3466
Party name: Nancy Lund, et al.
Other
Brian David Boone
    Counsel of Record
ALSTON & BIRD LLP
101 S. Tryon St.
Charlotte, NC 28280

brian.boone@alston.com
(704) 444-1000
Party name: 103 State Legislators
Douglas R. Cox
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dcox@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3531
Party name: Members of Congress
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@winston.com
(202) 282-5879
Party name: Pittsylvania County, Virginia
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202)546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Vaughn T. Sizemore
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
State Capitol, Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

vaughn.t.sizemore@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 20 other States, et al.
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley & Austin
1722 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

pzidlicky@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association