No. 17-5639
Title:Adaucto Chavez-Meza, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 17, 2017
Linked with 17A45
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2062)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2017Application (17A45) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 13, 2017 to August 14, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 10 2017Application (17A45) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 14, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 18, 2017)
Sep 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 18, 2017.
Sep 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 17, 2017.
Nov 17 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 01 2017Reply of petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 16 2018Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 23, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Brief of petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza filed (to be corrected and reprinted).
Feb 26 2018Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Joint appendix (Volume 1) filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief of petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza filed (Corrected brief received 3/26/18). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Adaucto Chavez-Meza
Blanket Consent
Mar 05 2018Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED, and Todd A. Coberly, Esquire, of Santa Fe, New Mexico, is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Mar 28 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A.10th Circuit.
Apr 03 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit. (1 Envelope)
Apr 13 2018Reply of petitioner Adaucto Chavez-Meza filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Argued. For petitioner: Todd A. Coberly, Santa Fe, N. M. (Appointed by this Court.) For respondent: Rod J. Rosenstein, Deputy Attorney General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 18 2018Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Ginsburg, and Alito, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
Jul 20 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Todd A. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Coberly & Martinez, LLLP
1322 Paseo de Peralta
Santa Fe, NM 87501

todd@coberlymartinez.com
(505) 989-1029
Party name: Adaucto Chavez-Meza
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law
Amy Mason Saharia
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

asaharia@wc.com
202-434-5847
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and National Association of Federal Defenders