No. 17-562
Title:Sheldon Silver, Petitioner
United States
Docketed:October 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1615)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 22 2017Reply of petitioner Sheldon Silver filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018Petition DENIED.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Francis Molo
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
430 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Party name: Sheldon Silver
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
Party name: United States