No. 17-5554
Title:Denard Stokeling, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 9, 2017
Linked with 16A1211
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12951)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2017Application (16A1211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 5, 2017 to August 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jun 12 2017Application (16A1211) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 4, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 29 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Aug 31 2017Second supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Sep 12 2017Response Requested. (Due October 12, 2017)
Oct 04 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Nov 08 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 27 2017Reply of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Third supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 19 2018Fourth supplemental brief of petitioner Denard Stokeling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 02 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda G. Bryn
    Counsel of Record
1 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1100

(954) 356-7436
Party name: Denard Stokeling
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States