No. 17-552
Title:Thomas Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Christopher Callahan, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Kevin Callahan, et ux.
Docketed:October 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-336)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Oct 30 2017Waiver of right of respondents Christopher Callahan, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 15 2017Response Requested. (Due December 15, 2017)
Dec 15 2017Brief of respondents Christopher Callahan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2017Reply of petitioner Thomas Wilson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Susan Ann Flynn
    Counsel of Record
100 Veterans Memorial Highway
Hauppauge, NY 11788

susan.flynn@suffolkcountyny.gov
(631) 853-4049
Party name: Thomas Wilson
Attorneys for Respondents
Donna Aldea
    Counsel of Record
Barket Marion Epstein & Kearon, LLP
666 Old County Road, Suite 700
Garden City, NY 11530

daldea@barketmarion.com
(516) 745-1500
Party name: Christopher Callahan, et al.