No. 17-5503
Title:Ramiro Ochoa, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4738)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 5, 2017)
Aug 11 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 31 2017Response Requested. (Due October 2, 2017)
Sep 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 14 2017Reply of petitioner Ramiro Ochoa filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaclyn Lee DiLauro
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
Eastern District of North Carolina
150 Fayetteville St., Suite 450
Raleigh, NC 27601

jackie_dilauro@fd.org
919-856-4236
Party name: Ramiro Ochoa
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States