No. 17-547
Title:Rims Barber, et al., Petitioners
v.
Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi, et al.
Docketed:October 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60477)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 29, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 01 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Rims Barber, et al.
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD) and National Center for Lesbian Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondent Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi, et al. in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of The Central Conference of American Rabbis, et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

Donald.Verrilli@MTO.com
(202) 220-1100
Party name: Rims Barber, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jfmitche@stanford.edu
(650) 723-1397
Party name: Phil Bryant, Governor of Mississippi, et al.
Other
Richard David Batchelder Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
Prudential Tower 800 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02199

richard.batchelder@ropesgray.com
6179517515
Party name: GLBTQ LEGAL ADVOCATES & DEFENDERS (GLAD) AND NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
1801 K Street, N.W
Suite 411
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Jeffrey S. Trachtman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
212 715 9175
Party name: The Central Conference of American Rabbis, et al
Daniel N. LermanRobbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner, & S
1801 K Street, NW
Suite 411L
Washington, DC 20006

dlerman@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4518
Party name: Church-State Scholars