No. 17-544
Title:Robert D. Vocke, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:October 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2390)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program and National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Government Employees filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan Shumsky
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 10019

eshumsky@orrick.com
(202) 339-8400
Party name: Rober D. Vocke, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merit Systems Protection Board
Other
Benjamin Conrad Block
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bblock@cov.com
(202) 662-5205
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program and National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.
William Henry Burgess IV
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

wburgess@kirkland.com
202-879-5957
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Andres Myles Grajales
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Government Employees, Office of the General Counsel
80 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

grajaa@afge.org
2026396426
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees
Paras Naresh Shah
    Counsel of Record
National Treasury Employees Union, Office of the General Counsel
1750 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

paras.shah@nteu.org
202.572.5553
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union