No. 17-540
Title:Starr International Company, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 11, 2017
Linked with 17A63
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-5103, 2015-5133)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2017Application (17A63) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2017 to September 6, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 21 2017Application (17A63) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 6, 2017.
Aug 22 2017Application (17A63) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2017 to October 6, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 25 2017Application (17A63) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 6, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2017 to January 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 12, 2018

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Boies
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
333 Main Street
Armonk, NY 10504

(914) 749-8200
Party name: Starr International Company, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation