No. 17-532
Title:Clayvin Herrera, Petitioner
v.
Wyoming
Docketed:October 10, 2017
Linked with 17A158
Lower Ct:District Court of Wyoming, Sheridan County
   Case Numbers:(2016-242)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 6, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2017Application (17A158) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2017 to October 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 09 2017Application (17A158) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 5, 2017.
Oct 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Clayvin Herrera
Oct 24 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Wyoming
Nov 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed.
Nov 09 2017Brief of respondent Wyoming in opposition filed.
Nov 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Crow Tribe of Indians filed.
Nov 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Timothy P. McCleary, et al. filed.
Nov 28 2017Reply of petitioner Clayvin Herrera filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 05 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Wyoming filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Clayvin Herrera filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 30 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Clayvin Herrera.
Blanket Consent
Aug 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 4, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2018.
Aug 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of Wyoming
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2018Brief of petitioner Clayvin Herrera filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Sep 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eastern Shoshone Tribe filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Natural Resources Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Southern Ute Indian Tribe and Ute Mountain Ute Tribe filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of National Congress of American Indians, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Pacific and Inland Northwest Treaty Tribes filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Timothy P. McCleary, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Crow Tribe of Indians filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 03 2018Motion of Clayvin Herrera for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (Corrected motion submitted - October 12, 2018)
Oct 11 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Brief of respondent Wyoming filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George William Hicks Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

george.hicks@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Clayvin Herrera
Attorneys for Respondent
Peter K. Michael
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, 2320 Capitol Avenue
Cheyenne, WY 82002

peter.michael@wyo.gov
307-777-7841
Party name: Wyoming
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Monte Tyler Mills
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Blewett III School of Law at the University of Montana
32 Campus Drive
Missoula, MO 59812

monte.mills@umantana.edu
406)243-2544
Party name: Indian Law Professors
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Timothy P. McCleary, et al.
William Francis Bacon
    Counsel of Record
1600 Arlington
Pocatello, ID 83204

bbacon@sbtribes.com
(208) 478-3822
Party name: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation
Daniel David Lewerenz1514 P Street NW, Suite D
Washington, DC 20005

lewerenz@narf.org
202 785 4166
Party name: Crow Tribe of Indians
Colette Routel
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Hamline School of Law
875 Summit Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55105

colette.routel@mitchellhamline.edu
6512906327
Party name: Natural Resources Law Professors
Thomas Harrold Shipps
    Counsel of Record
Maynes, Bradford, Shipps et al
835 E. Second Avenue
Suite 123
Durango, CO 81301

tshipps@mbssllp.com
9702471755
Party name: Southern Ute Indian Tribe and Ute Mountain Ute Tribe
Marc D. Slonim
    Counsel of Record
Ziontz Chestnut
2101 Fourth Avenue
Suite 1230
Seattle, WA 98121

mslonim@ziontzchestnut.com
2064481230
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Rob Roy Smith
    Counsel of Record
KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP
1420 Fifth Ave.
Suite 3700
Seattle, WA 98101

jblack@kilpatricktownsend.com
206-467-9600
Party name: PACIFIC AND INLAND NORTHWEST TREATY TRIBES
Richard G. Verri
    Counsel of Record
Rosette, LLP
Attorneys at Law
565 W. Chandler Blvd., Suite 212
Chandler, AZ 85225

rverri@rosettelaw.com
4808898990
Party name: Eastern Shoshone Tribe
Heather Daphne Whiteman Runs Him
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1506 Broadway
Boulder, CO 80302

heatherw@narf.org
3034478760
Party name: Crow Tribe of Indians