No. 17-522
Title:Anne Marie Hankins, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 5, 2017
Linked with 17A185
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-30345)
   Decision Date:June 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2017Application (17A185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2017 to October 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 17 2017Application (17A185) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 5, 2017.
Oct 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2017)
Nov 03 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202)-879-3939
Party name: Ann Hankins
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States