No. 17-5165
Title:Pedro Serrano, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 13, 2017
Linked with 17A61
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4321(L), 17-461(CON))
   Decision Date:May 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 14, 2017)
Jul 11 2017Application (17A61) for a stay, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jul 17 2017Application (17A61) denied by Justice Ginsburg.
Aug 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2017.
Sep 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Oct 25 2017Reply of petitioner Pedro Serrano filed.
Nov 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edward Scott Zas
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of New York, Inc., Appeals Bureau
52 Duane Street, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10007

edward_zas@fd.org
212 417 8742
Party name: Pedro Serrano
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States